IA SSB1148 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF446
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to asset forfeiture by prohibiting civil asset forfeiture for property valued at less than a minimum amount, raising the standard of proof for asset forfeiture, prohibiting the transfer of certain seized property to the federal government for forfeiture, requiring a proportionality review for property to be forfeited, and requiring law enforcement agencies to retain certain records related to asset forfeiture and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to asset forfeiture by prohibiting civil asset forfeiture for property valued at less than a minimum amount, raising the standard of proof for asset forfeiture, prohibiting the transfer of certain seized property to the federal government for forfeiture, requiring a proportionality review for property to be forfeited, and requiring law enforcement agencies to retain certain records related to asset forfeiture and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2017 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schneider, Dawson, and Taylor. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF446 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1148 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1148.html |