IA SF446 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to asset forfeiture by prohibiting civil asset forfeiture for property valued at less than a minimum amount, raising the standard of proof for asset forfeiture, requiring a proportionality review for property to be forfeited, and requiring law enforcement agencies to retain certain records related to asset forfeiture and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1148.) Effective 7-1-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to asset forfeiture by prohibiting civil asset forfeiture for property valued at less than a minimum amount, raising the standard of proof for asset forfeiture, requiring a proportionality review for property to be forfeited, and requiring law enforcement agencies to retain certain records related to asset forfeiture and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1148.) Effective 7-1-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 1136.
2017-04-25SenateSent to Governor. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-25SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-11SenateMessage from House. S.J. 954.
2017-04-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 960.
2017-04-11HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 981.
2017-04-10HousePassed House, ayes 95, nays 1. H.J. 933.
2017-04-06HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905.
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 821.
2017-03-28HouseSubcommittee: Heartsill, Baltimore and Wolfe. H.J. 804.
2017-03-28HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 799.
2017-03-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 797.
2017-03-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 795.
2017-03-29SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 822.
2017-03-28SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 794.
2017-03-28SenateAmendment S-3261 filed, adopted. S.J. 794.
2017-03-27SenateFiscal note. Senate Clip Sheet.
2017-03-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 480.
2017-03-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 474.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback