IA SSB1137 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF280
Note: Legislation replaced by SF318
Note: Legislation replaced by SF318
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the department of transportation to renew certain valid commercial driver's licenses without examination, including by electronic renewal, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 318.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the department of transportation to renew certain valid commercial driver's licenses without examination, including by electronic renewal, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 318.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 318. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Dickey, Giddens, and Rozenboom. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 11:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Giddens, and Rozenboom. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB99 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 280.
HF280 (Replaced by) 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
SF318 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 691.
HF280 (Replaced by) 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
SF318 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 691.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1137 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1137.html |