IA HF280 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the department of transportation to renew certain valid commercial driver's licenses without examination, including by electronic renewal, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 99.) Effective date: 04/02/2021.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the department of transportation to renew certain valid commercial driver's licenses without examination, including by electronic renewal, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 99.) Effective date: 04/02/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 884. |
2021-04-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 884. |
2021-03-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 693. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 690. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Substituted for SF 318. S.J. 690. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 318. S.J. 342. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 342. |
2021-02-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 318. |
2021-02-08 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays none. H.J. 316. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 233. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB99 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 280.
SSB1137 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 318.
SF318 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 691.
SSB1137 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 318.
SF318 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 691.