IA SSB1118 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain charges for consumer credit transactions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain charges for consumer credit transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 2:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 2:30PM Room 206 (Cancelled) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Breitbach, Zumbach, and Boulton. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF418 (Replaced by) 2017-04-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF559 (Replaced by) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
HF630 (Replaced by) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
SF502 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
HSB126 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 491.
HF559 (Replaced by) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
HF630 (Replaced by) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
SF502 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
HSB126 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 491.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1118 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1118.html |