IA HF559 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consumer credit transactions establishing and increasing specified charges and penalties. (Formerly HSB 126)(See HF 630.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to consumer credit transactions establishing and increasing specified charges and penalties. (Formerly HSB 126)(See HF 630.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1035. |
2017-03-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 879. |
2017-03-21 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, Cownie and McConkey. H.J. 709. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 554. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1118 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB126 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 491.
SF418 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF630 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
SF502 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
HSB126 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 491.
SF418 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF630 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
SF502 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF559 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF559.html |