IA SSB1099 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF131
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the credit union division of the department of commerce.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the credit union division of the department of commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2023 11:30AM Room G15. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Westrich, Bousselot, and Giddens. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB35 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 131.
HF131 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
HF131 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1099 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1099.html |