IA SSB1091 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF319
Note: Legislation replaced by HF495
Note: Legislation replaced by HF495
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain reporting dates for cities which receive road use tax fund moneys.(See SF 319.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain reporting dates for cities which receive road use tax fund moneys.(See SF 319.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 319. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2021 1:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Bisignano, and Shipley. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB101 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 335.
SF319 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 655.
HF495 (Replaced by) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
SF319 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 655.
HF495 (Replaced by) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1091 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1091.html |