IA SSB1090 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF340

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations for recovery from injuries to a person or property from a licensed veterinarian.(See SF 340.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations for recovery from injuries to a person or property from a licensed veterinarian.(See SF 340.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 340.
2021-01-28SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 8:00AM RM 111.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Kinney, and Schultz.
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 154.
2021-01-25SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SF340 (Replaced by) 2021-02-11 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 335.
HSB208 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback