IA SSB1080 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF395
Note: Legislation replaced by HF588
Note: Legislation replaced by HF588
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 8:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 8:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the establishment of permanent emergency personnel positions directly related to certain disasters.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the establishment of permanent emergency personnel positions directly related to certain disasters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 8:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Zaun, and Jochum. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB112 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 494.
SF395 (Replaced by) 2018-01-09 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Zaun. S.J. 68.
HF588 (Replaced by) 2017-03-09 - Introduced, referred to Labor. H.J. 601.
SF395 (Replaced by) 2018-01-09 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Zaun. S.J. 68.
HF588 (Replaced by) 2017-03-09 - Introduced, referred to Labor. H.J. 601.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1080 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1080.html |