IA SSB1078 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF210
Note: Legislation replaced by HF273
Note: Legislation replaced by HF273
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 210.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 210.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the term brain health.(See SF 210.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the term brain health.(See SF 210.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 210. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2023 10:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Salmon, Alons, and Trone Garriott. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB76 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 273.
SF210 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 1091.
HF273 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 1029.
SF210 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 1091.
HF273 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 1029.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1078 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1078.html |