IA SSB1068 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF230
Note: Legislation replaced by HF358

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 230.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to eluding or attempting to elude a pursuing law enforcement vehicle, and providing penalties.(See SF 230.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to eluding or attempting to elude a pursuing law enforcement vehicle, and providing penalties.(See SF 230.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-08SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 230.
2023-02-02SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-01-30SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-01-23SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Boulton, and Evans.
2023-01-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2023-01-23SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB83 (Related) 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 358.
SF230 (Replaced by) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 810.
HF358 (Replaced by) 2023-05-16 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback