IA HF358 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to law enforcement, including eluding or attempting to elude a pursuing law enforcement vehicle, temporary restricted driver's licenses associated with that offense, and the authority of a peace officer to make an arrest for any public offense anywhere within the state, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 83.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to law enforcement, including eluding or attempting to elude a pursuing law enforcement vehicle, temporary restricted driver's licenses associated with that offense, and the authority of a peace officer to make an arrest for any public offense anywhere within the state, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 83.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 952. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 951. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 859. |
2023-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 886. |
2023-04-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 901. |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 870. |
2023-04-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1257. H.J. 870. |
2023-04-18 | House | Senate amendment H-1257 filed. H.J. 866. |
2023-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 864. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 811. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 43, nays 7. S.J. 809. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3134 filed, adopted. S.J. 809. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Substituted for SF 230. S.J. 809. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 230. S.J. 572. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 572. |
2023-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 620. |
2023-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 653. |
2023-03-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 3. H.J. 611. |
2023-03-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 370. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1068 (Related) 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 230.
HSB83 (Related) 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 358.
SF230 (Similar To) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 810.
HSB83 (Related) 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 358.
SF230 (Similar To) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 810.