IA SSB1062 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF569
Note: Legislation replaced by SF426
Note: Legislation replaced by SF426
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act including personal degradation of a dependent adult as a form of dependent adult abuse by a caretaker regulated by the department of human services, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act including personal degradation of a dependent adult as a form of dependent adult abuse by a caretaker regulated by the department of human services, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Kinney and Nunn. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB112 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 365.
HF569 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF426 (Replaced by) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1088.
HF569 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF426 (Replaced by) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1088.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1062 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1062.html |