IA HSB112 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF569
Note: Legislation replaced by SF426
Note: Legislation replaced by SF426
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act including personal degradation of a dependent adult as a form of dependent adult abuse by a caretaker regulated by the department of human services, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act including personal degradation of a dependent adult as a form of dependent adult abuse by a caretaker regulated by the department of human services, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 365. |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Bergan and B. Meyer. H.J. 206. |
2019-02-04 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1062 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF569 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF426 (Replaced by) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1088.
HF569 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF426 (Replaced by) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1088.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB112 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB112.html |