IA SSB1054 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF243

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 243.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to public safety including the crimes of failure to assist, abuse of a corpse, and interference with official acts, and providing penalties.(See SF 243.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to public safety including the crimes of failure to assist, abuse of a corpse, and interference with official acts, and providing penalties.(See SF 243.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 243.
2021-01-25SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-20SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2021 12:00PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Dawson, and Kinney.
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-19SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SF243 (Replaced by) 2021-02-08 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback