IA SF243 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public safety including the crimes of failure to assist, abuse of a corpse, and interference with official acts, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1054.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public safety including the crimes of failure to assist, abuse of a corpse, and interference with official acts, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1054.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1117. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1068. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 1064. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3198. S.J. 1064. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3198. S.J. 1019. |
2021-04-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1031. |
2021-05-06 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1076. |
2021-04-29 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1034. |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 1029. |
2021-04-28 | House | Amendment H-1414 out of order. H.J. 1029. |
2021-04-28 | House | Amendment H-1423 filed, adopted. H.J. 1028. |
2021-04-26 | House | Amendment H-1414 filed. H.J. 1003. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 919. |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 878. |
2021-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 1:15PM House Lounge. |
2021-03-25 | House | Subcommittee: Gobble, Sunde and Thorup. H.J. 855. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 759. |
2021-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 740. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 618. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 615. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3083 filed, adopted. S.J. 615. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 255. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 248. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1054 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 243.