IA SSB1052 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF501
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain fees collected by the county sheriff.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain fees collected by the county sheriff.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2017 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2017 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/13/2017 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2017 2:30PM RM 206 (Cancelled) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Quirmbach. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SF501 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1052 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1052.html |