IA SF501 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain fees collected by the county sheriff. (Formerly SSB 1052.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain fees collected by the county sheriff. (Formerly SSB 1052.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1119. |
2017-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1125. |
2017-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 1124. |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1116. |
2017-04-17 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, McConkey and Windschitl. H.J. 1036. |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1002. |
2017-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1001. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 984. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 1. S.J. 982. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 932. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 931. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1052 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.