IA SSB1051 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF236
Note: Legislation replaced by SF489
Note: Legislation replaced by SF489
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the possession, sale, transfer, purchase, and use of fireworks, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the possession, sale, transfer, purchase, and use of fireworks, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2017 12:00PM RM 22 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Schultz, and Petersen. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2017 12:00PM Room 206 (Cancelled) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Schultz, and Bisignano. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF236 (Replaced by) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF489 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
HSB171 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Bloomingdale and Jacoby. H.J. 517.
SF489 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
HSB171 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Bloomingdale and Jacoby. H.J. 517.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1051 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1051.html |