IA SF236 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the possession, sale, transfer, purchase, and use of fireworks, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1051; See SF 489.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the possession, sale, transfer, purchase, and use of fireworks, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1051; See SF 489.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 371. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 273. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 265. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 260. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1051 (Related) 2017-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB171 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Bloomingdale and Jacoby. H.J. 517.
SF489 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
HSB171 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Bloomingdale and Jacoby. H.J. 517.
SF489 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF236 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF236.html |