IA SSB1050 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF243
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for covered individuals for the treatment of autism spectrum disorder.
Title
A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for covered individuals for the treatment of autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Westrich, Petersen, and Schultz. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB74 (Related) 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 243.
HF243 (Replaced by) 2023-02-21 - Subcommittee: Westrich, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 372.
HF243 (Replaced by) 2023-02-21 - Subcommittee: Westrich, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 372.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1050 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1050.html |