IA SSB1040 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF231
Note: Legislation replaced by HF311
Note: Legislation replaced by HF311
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to provisions applicable to life insurance companies and associations, and credit for reinsurance, and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to provisions applicable to life insurance companies and associations, and credit for reinsurance, and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2017 8:30AM 206 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Guth, C. Johnson, and Lykam. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB22 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 249.
SF231 (Replaced by) 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
HF311 (Replaced by) 2017-03-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 678.
SF231 (Replaced by) 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
HF311 (Replaced by) 2017-03-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 678.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1040 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1040.html |