IA SF231 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to provisions applicable to life insurance companies and associations, and credit for reinsurance, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1040.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to provisions applicable to life insurance companies and associations, and credit for reinsurance, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1040.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 525. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | HF 311 substituted. S.J. 520. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 311. S.J. 391. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 264. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 259. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB22 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 249.
SSB1040 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF311 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 678.
SSB1040 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF311 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 678.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF231 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF231.html |