IA SSB1033 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF237
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of public accountants.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of public accountants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Anderson, Schneider, and Jochum. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2017 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF237 (Replaced by) 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1112.
HSB116 (Related) 2017-02-24 - Passed subcommittee.
HSB116 (Related) 2017-02-24 - Passed subcommittee.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1033 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1033.html |