IA SF237 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1112.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1112.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of public accountants. (Formerly SSB 1033.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of public accountants. (Formerly SSB 1033.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1112. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 860. |
2017-04-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 863. |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0. H.J. 858. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 822. |
2017-03-13 | House | Subcommittee: Cownie, Bacon and Oldson. H.J. 627. |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 569. |
2017-03-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 553. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 525. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 561. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 523. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3096 filed, adopted. S.J. 522. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 266. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 260. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1033 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB116 (Related) 2017-02-24 - Passed subcommittee.
HSB116 (Related) 2017-02-24 - Passed subcommittee.