IA SSB1029 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF485
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 485.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 485.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring employers to provide reasonable accommodations to employees based on pregnancy or childbirth and making penalties applicable.(See SF 485.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring employers to provide reasonable accommodations to employees based on pregnancy or childbirth and making penalties applicable.(See SF 485.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 485. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Driscoll, Boulton, and Whiting. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 10:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Boulton, and Brown. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR AND BUSINESS RELATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF485 (Replaced by) 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1029 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1029.html |