IA SSB1029 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF139
Note: Legislation replaced by HF420
Note: Legislation replaced by HF420
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a financial literacy requirement under the state's educational standards.
Title
A bill for an act relating to a financial literacy requirement under the state's educational standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Sinclair, and Danielson.. S.J. 126. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SF139 (Replaced by) 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
HSB128 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 290.
HF420 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
HSB128 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 290.
HF420 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1029 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1029.html |