IA SSB1018 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF130
Note: Legislation replaced by HF118
Note: Legislation replaced by HF118
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2017 2:30PM RM 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2017 2:30PM RM 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public funding and regulatory matters and making, reducing, transferring, and supplementing appropriations for expenditures in the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2016, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public funding and regulatory matters and making, reducing, transferring, and supplementing appropriations for expenditures in the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2016, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2017 2:30PM RM 22 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
HSB27 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Passed subcommittee.
SF130 (Replaced by) 2017-02-01 - NOBA: Graybook
HF118 (Replaced by) 2017-01-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 145.
SF130 (Replaced by) 2017-02-01 - NOBA: Graybook
HF118 (Replaced by) 2017-01-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 145.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1018 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1018.html |