IA SSB1010 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF231
Note: Legislation replaced by SF242

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 242.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to a special sentence for sexual abuse committed during a burglary.(See SF 242.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to a special sentence for sexual abuse committed during a burglary.(See SF 242.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 242.
2021-01-20SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 11:00AM RM 24A.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Kinney, and Sinclair.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB18 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 231.
HF231 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Message from Senate. H.J. 443.
SF242 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 372.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback