IA SF242 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a special sentence for sexual abuse committed during a burglary.(Formerly SSB 1010.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to a special sentence for sexual abuse committed during a burglary.(Formerly SSB 1010.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 372. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | HF 231 substituted. S.J. 371. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 231. S.J. 364. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 254. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 247. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1010 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 242.
HSB18 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 231.
HF231 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.
HSB18 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 231.
HF231 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.