IA SSB1003 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF184
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the use of primary road fund moneys for the secondary road and municipal street systems.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the use of primary road fund moneys for the secondary road and municipal street systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2017 10:00AM Room 206 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kapucian, Breitbach, and Danielson. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SF184 (Replaced by) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 579.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1003 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1003.html |