IA SSB1002 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF234

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the use of electronic communication devices to write, send, or read text messages while driving as a primary offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the use of electronic communication devices to write, send, or read text messages while driving as a primary offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-18SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2017-01-12SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2017 11:30AM Room 206
2017-01-11SenateSubcommittee: Breitbach, Bertrand, and Bowman.
2017-01-11SenateBy COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

SF234 (Replaced by) 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1043.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback