IA SF234 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1043.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1043.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of electronic communication devices to write, send, or view electronic messages while driving as a primary offense, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1002.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of electronic communication devices to write, send, or view electronic messages while driving as a primary offense, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1002.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1043. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1023. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1023. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 953. |
2017-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 960. |
2017-04-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed House, ayes 90, nays 6. H.J. 928. |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 927. |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1315. H.J. 927. |
2017-04-10 | House | Point of order raised on H-1315, ruled not germane. H.J. 926. |
2017-04-10 | House | Amendment H-1318 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 926. |
2017-04-06 | House | Amendment H-1315 filed. H.J. 919. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 810. |
2017-03-23 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Bacon and Olson. H.J. 766. |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 762. |
2017-03-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 754. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 726. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 787. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 43, nays 6. S.J. 725. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3222 filed, adopted. S.J. 725. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 266. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 260. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1002 (Related) 2017-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.