IA SSB1002 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF201

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A study bill for an act relating to the findings of an examining physician assistant for a person believed to be seriously mentally impaired in an emergency situation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A study bill for an act relating to the findings of an examining physician assistant for a person believed to be seriously mentally impaired in an emergency situation.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-09SenateVoted - Human Resources.
2015-02-03Senate4:00PM; Room 206 Human Resources.
2015-01-15SenateHuman Resources: Bolkcom Chair, and Dotzler, and Segebart.
2015-01-15SenateHuman Resources: Bolkcom Chair,Dotzler, and Segebart.
2015-01-13SenateIn Human Resources
2015-01-13SenateDate Recorded

Same As/Similar To

SF201 (Replaced by) 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 897.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback