IA SF201 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 897.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the findings of an examining physician assistant for a person believed to be seriously mentally impaired in an emergency situation. (Formerly SSB 1002.) Effective 7-1-15.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the findings of an examining physician assistant for a person believed to be seriously mentally impaired in an emergency situation. (Formerly SSB 1002.) Effective 7-1-15.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-17SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 897.
2015-04-14SenateSent to Governor. S.J. 864.
2015-04-14SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 864.
2015-04-07SenateMessage from House. S.J. 790.
2015-04-07HouseImmediate message. H.J. 786.
2015-04-14HouseExplanations of votes. H.J. 841.
2015-04-07HousePassed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 774.
2015-03-27HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 723.
2015-03-25HousePassed subcommittee.
2015-02-25HouseSubcommittee, L. Miller, Dawson, and R. Taylor. H.J. 416.
2015-02-25HouseRead first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 412.
2015-02-25HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 407.
2015-02-24SenateImmediate message. S.J. 365.
2015-02-24SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 365.
2015-02-10SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 271.
2015-02-10SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 267.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback