IA SJR9 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 21. S.J. 493.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa that the Constitution of the State of Iowa does not secure or protect a right to or require the funding of abortion. (See SJR 21, SJR 2001.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa that the Constitution of the State of Iowa does not secure or protect a right to or require the funding of abortion. (See SJR 21, SJR 2001.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 21. S.J. 493.
2019-01-29SenateSubcommittee: Chapman, Celsi, and R. Smith. S.J. 186.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 162.

Same As/Similar To

SJR21 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Reported out of committee as SJR 2001. S.J. 152.
SJR2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Introduced, passed on file. H.J. 286.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback