IA SJR21 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Reported out of committee as SJR 2001. S.J. 152.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Reported out of committee as SJR 2001. S.J. 152.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa that the Constitution of the State of Iowa does not secure or protect a right to or require the funding of abortion. (Formerly SJR 9; See SJR 2001.)
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa that the Constitution of the State of Iowa does not secure or protect a right to or require the funding of abortion. (Formerly SJR 9; See SJR 2001.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported out of committee as SJR 2001. S.J. 152. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/16/2020 11:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Celsi, and R. Smith. S.J. 85. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 859. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 493. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 478. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR9 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 21. S.J. 493.
SJR2001 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amendment H-8199 filed. H.J. 646.
SJR2001 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amendment H-8199 filed. H.J. 646.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SJR21 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SJR21.html |