IA SJR2008 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Subcommittee, Winckler, Ficken, and Forristall. H.J. 689.
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Subcommittee, Winckler, Ficken, and Forristall. H.J. 689.
Summary
A joint resolution nullifying rules adopted by the educational examiners board, and relating to the contents of a complaint notice, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3202.)
Title
A joint resolution nullifying rules adopted by the educational examiners board, and relating to the contents of a complaint notice, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3202.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Subcommittee, Winckler, Ficken, and Forristall. H.J. 689. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 617. | |
2010-02-18 | Message from Senate. H.J. 603. | |
2010-02-17 | Immediate message. S.J. 467. | |
2010-02-17 | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays none. S.J. 458. | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 349. | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 345. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SJR&key=0842B&ga=83 |