IA SF97 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Subcommittee reassigned, Danielson, Jochum, and Smith. S.J. 116.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Subcommittee reassigned, Danielson, Jochum, and Smith. S.J. 116.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act repealing the option of voting straight party and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act repealing the option of voting straight party and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, Danielson, Jochum, and Smith. S.J. 116. |
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee, Danielson, Jochum, and Sorenson. S.J. 180. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 159. |