IA SF93 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to abandoned structures and abatement of public nuisances. Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to abandoned structures and abatement of public nuisances. Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1037. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1136. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1135. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3232. S.J. 1134. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3232. S.J. 1133. |
2019-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1036. |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 90 nays 8. H.J. 1023. |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment H-1284 adopted. H.J. 1023. |
2019-04-25 | House | Substituted for HF 780. H.J. 1023. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1284 filed. H.J. 984. |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 583. |
2019-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 582. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 660. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 659. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3010 adopted. S.J. 659. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3010 filed. S.J. 366. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 366. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Boulton, and Edler. S.J. 176. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 156. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB172 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.
HF676 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
HF780 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
HF676 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
HF780 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.