IA HF676 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to abandoned structures and abatement of public nuisances. (Formerly HSB 172; See HF 780.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to abandoned structures and abatement of public nuisances. (Formerly HSB 172; See HF 780.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1042. |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925. |
2019-04-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-17 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Nielsen. H.J. 900. |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/18/2019 8:45AM House Lounge. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 478. |
Same As/Similar To
SF93 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
HSB172 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.
HF780 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
HSB172 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.
HF780 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF676 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF676.html |