IA SF69 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the repeal of the state inheritance tax and the state qualified use inheritance tax.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the repeal of the state inheritance tax and the state qualified use inheritance tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Edler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 217. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 158. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 123. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF69 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF69.html |