IA SF67 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 335. S.J. 367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 335. S.J. 367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to standards for carbon monoxide protection and making penalties applicable. (See SF 335.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to standards for carbon monoxide protection and making penalties applicable. (See SF 335.)
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Shipley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 335. S.J. 367. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Celsi, and Miller-Meeks. S.J. 146. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 109. |
Same As/Similar To
SF335 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 311.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF67 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF67.html |