IA SF335 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to standards for carbon monoxide protection and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 67.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to standards for carbon monoxide protection and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 67.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 311. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 11:30AM RM G17. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Giddens, and Miller-Meeks. S.J. 86. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 367. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 361. |
Same As/Similar To
SF67 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 335. S.J. 367.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF335 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF335.html |