IA SF640 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1152.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging. (Formerly SF 131.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging. (Formerly SF 131.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 1152.
2019-04-26SenateHF 760 substituted. S.J. 1151.
2019-04-26SenateAmendment S-3239 filed, adopted. S.J. 1151.
2019-04-26SenateFiscal note.
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 1140.
2019-04-25SenateIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1139.

Same As/Similar To

SF131 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 640. S.J. 1140.
HF171 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
HF760 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Message from Senate. H.J. 1075.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback