IA HF760 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging. (Formerly HF 171.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging. (Formerly HF 171.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2020-06-13SenateMessage from Senate. H.J. 746.
2020-06-13HouseImmediate message. S.J. 805.
2020-06-13HousePassed Senate, yeas 47, nays 2. S.J. 805.
2020-06-13HouseConference committee report adopted. S.J. 804.
2020-06-13HouseMessage from House. S.J. 803.
2020-06-12SenateConference committee report filed. S.J. 802.
2020-06-12SenateImmediate message. H.J. 743.
2020-06-12SenatePassed House, yeas 93, nays 4. H.J. 724.
2020-06-12SenateConference committee report adopted. H.J. 723.
2020-06-12SenateConference committee report filed. H.J. 723.
2020-06-12SenateSenate conference committee appointed: R. Smith, chair; Behn, Cournoyer, Jochum, and Wahls. S.J. 783.
2020-06-11SenateMessage from House. S.J. 778.
2020-06-11HouseImmediate message. H.J. 700.
2020-06-11HouseConference committee appointed: Hite, Chair; Mommsen, Wills, Kurth and Wolfe H.J. 695.
2020-06-11HouseHouse insists on H-1316 as amended H.J. 694.
2019-04-27HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1075.
2019-04-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1179.
2019-04-27SenateSenate refused to concur with S-3261. S.J. 1179.
2019-04-26SenatePassed House, yeas 91 nays 4. H.J. 1053.
2019-04-26SenatePassed House, yeas 91 nays 4. H.J. 1053.
2019-04-26SenateImmediate message. H.J. 1053.
2019-04-27SenateExplanation of vote. H.J. 1077.
2019-04-26SenateHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-1316 as amended. H.J. 1052.
2019-04-26SenateAmendment H-1319 to Senate amendment H-1316 filed, adopted. H.J. 1052.
2019-04-26SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 1. S.J. 1152.
2019-04-26SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 1. S.J. 1152.
2019-04-26SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1153.
2019-04-26SenateAmendment S-3238 filed, adopted. S.J. 1152.
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for SF 640. S.J. 1151.
2019-04-25SenateAttached to similar SF 640. S.J. 1140.
2019-04-25SenateSubcommittee: Committee of the Whole. S.J. 1140.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1103.
2019-04-24SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1103.
2019-04-24HousePassed House, yeas 96 nays 4. H.J. 999.
2019-04-24HousePassed House, yeas 96 nays 4. H.J. 999.
2019-04-24HouseAmendment H-1204 adopted. H.J. 998.
2019-04-24HouseAmendment H-1289 to amendment H-1204 withdrawn. H.J. 998.
2019-04-23HouseAmendment H-1289 filed. H.J. 984.
2019-04-11HouseAmendment H-1204 filed. H.J. 844.
2019-04-04HouseFiscal note.
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 712.

Same As/Similar To

SF131 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 640. S.J. 1140.
HF171 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
SF640 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1152.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback