IA SF634 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-23 - Fiscal note, revised.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-23 - Fiscal note, revised.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to local government budgets and property taxation by modifying provisions governing the establishment and approval of county and city budgets, modifying provisions relating to the state appraisal manual, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1260.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to local government budgets and property taxation by modifying provisions governing the establishment and approval of county and city budgets, modifying provisions relating to the state appraisal manual, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1260.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-23 | Senate | Fiscal note, revised. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1198. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1194. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1114. |
2019-04-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1011. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 53 nays 47. H.J. 1010. |
2019-04-24 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 1010. |
2019-04-24 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1010. |
2019-04-24 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1303. H.J. 1009. |
2019-04-24 | House | Point of order raised on H-1303, ruled not germane. H.J. 1009. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1303 filed. H.J. 1009. |
2019-04-24 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1009. |
2019-04-24 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1301. H.J. 1008. |
2019-04-24 | House | Point of order raised on H-1301, ruled not germane. H.J. 1008. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1301 filed. H.J. 1008. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1302 filed, lost. H.J. 1007. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1304 lost. H.J. 1006. |
2019-04-24 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 1006. |
2019-04-24 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 1005. |
2019-04-24 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 1005. |
2019-04-24 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 1005. |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment H-1304 filed. H.J. 1005. |
2019-04-24 | House | Substituted for HF 773. H.J. 1005. |
2019-04-24 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 1002. |
2019-04-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1002. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1103. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 17. S.J. 1102. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3206 adopted. S.J. 1101. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3220 to S-3206 filed, lost. S.J. 1101. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 1071. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3206 filed. S.J. 1075. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1022. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1020. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1260 (Related) 2019-04-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.