IA SF621 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee amendment H-8146 filed. H.J. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee amendment H-8146 filed. H.J. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 126, SF 515.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 126, SF 515.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee amendment H-8146 filed. H.J. 579. |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Ways and Means calendar H.J. 569. |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 568. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Nielsen and Osmundson. H.J. 163. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 36. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 965. |
2019-04-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 962. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1062. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1062. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3198 adopted. S.J. 1062. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3198 filed. S.J. 1045. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 948. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 946. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB77 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Bergan, Jacobsen and Konfrst. H.J. 80.
SF126 (Similar To) 2020-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 515. S.J. 490.
SF515 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 621. S.J. 948.
SF126 (Similar To) 2020-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 515. S.J. 490.
SF515 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 621. S.J. 948.