IA SF126 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 515. S.J. 490.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adult adoptee, and providing for fees. (See SF 515; SF 621.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adult adoptee, and providing for fees. (See SF 515; SF 621.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 515. S.J. 490.
2019-01-29SenateSubcommittee: Zaun, Hogg, and Sweeney. S.J. 188.
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 173.

Same As/Similar To

HSB77 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Bergan, Jacobsen and Konfrst. H.J. 80.
SF515 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 621. S.J. 948.
SF621 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback